This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/09/2023 at 10:37:09 (UTC).

RUEDA, FERNANDO MIGUEL RUIZ VS GOMEZ, MICHELLENY BARROS

Case Summary

On 07/11/2022 RUEDA, FERNANDO MIGUEL RUIZ filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against GOMEZ, MICHELLENY BARROS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KAUFMAN, SHELLEY and PELLMAN, AMY M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0007

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KAUFMAN, SHELLEY

PELLMAN, AMY M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RUEDA FERNANDO MIGUEL RUIZ

Respondent

GOMEZ MICHELLENY BARROS

Not Classified By Court

GASCON GEORGE - District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BIER KURT

Respondent Attorney

VIVAS GABRIEL CRUZ

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/1/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/31/2023: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service (Comment)

1/30/2023: Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service (Comment)

Miscellaneous - Report to the Court

1/30/2023: Miscellaneous - Report to the Court

Minute Order

1/4/2023: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

12/20/2022: Stipulation and Order

Proposed - Stipulation and Order - Proposed - Stipulation and Order

12/15/2022: Proposed - Stipulation and Order - Proposed - Stipulation and Order

Minute Order

12/13/2022: Minute Order

Exhibit List - Exhibit List

12/6/2022: Exhibit List - Exhibit List

Witness List - Witness List

12/6/2022: Witness List - Witness List

Exhibit List - Exhibit List

11/29/2022: Exhibit List - Exhibit List

Trial Brief - Trial Brief

11/29/2022: Trial Brief - Trial Brief

Opposition - RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO HAGUE PETITION (Oppositions)

11/29/2022: Opposition - RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO HAGUE PETITION (Oppositions)

Witness List - Witness List

11/29/2022: Witness List - Witness List

Minute Order

11/8/2022: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney (Comment)

10/24/2022: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney (Comment)

Miscellaneous - Request For Additional Time (Comment)

10/11/2022: Miscellaneous - Request For Additional Time (Comment)

Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service (Comment)

10/10/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service (Comment)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/01/2023

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Kaufman, Shelley, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Order Made

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Kaufman, Shelley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held - Order Made

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023

DocketProof of Service (Proof of Electronic Service (Comment) ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (Report to the Court ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Kaufman, Shelley, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
09/15/2022

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2022

DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2022

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022

DocketMiscellaneous (Points and Authorities in Support of Expedited Proceedings Under The Hague Convention ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law (For a Warrant In Lieu of a Writ of Hebeas Corpus ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law (for Return of Minor Child to Petitioner Under The Hague Convention and Declaration of Rosa Alarcon ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022

DocketMiscellaneous (Memoradum of Law ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022

DocketNotice (of Application for the Return of the Minor Child Under The Hague Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abdution. ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less