This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2021 at 16:11:47 (UTC).

RUDBEL O. RIVAS MIRANDA VS RAHIMDUN JAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 RUDBEL O RIVAS MIRANDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAHIMDUN JAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9168

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVAS MIRANDA RUDBEL O.

Defendants

1 TO 30 DOES

JAN RAHIMDUN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DE LA ROSA MARIO M

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/9/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2024
  • Hearing08/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • Hearing02/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • Hearing01/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rudbel O. Rivas Miranda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rudbel O. Rivas Miranda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rudbel O. Rivas Miranda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE LA ROSA MARIO M