This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 03:30:42 (UTC).

RUBY O MAYEN VS FH & HF- TORRANCE I, LLC DBA SUNNYSIDE NURSING AND POST-ACUTE CARE

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 RUBY O MAYEN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against FH HF- TORRANCE I, LLC DBA SUNNYSIDE NURSING AND POST-ACUTE CARE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD L. FRUIN and LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3238

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD L. FRUIN

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAYEN RUBY O

Defendants

FH & HF- TORRANCE I LLC DBA SUNNYSIDE NURSING AND POST-ACUTE CARE

FH & HF- TORRANCE I LLC DBA DBA SUNNYSIDE NURSING AND POST-ACUTE CARE A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CUSTIS KEITH

CUSTIS KEITH A.

Defendant Attorney

CHIU STACEY GLENN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/1/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/31/2020: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE C.C.P. 170.6)

9/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE C.C.P. 170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE C.C.P. 170.6) OF 09/04/2020

9/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE C.C.P. 170.6) OF 09/04/2020

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

9/4/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

9/4/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

9/18/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER (JOINT) TO SUBMIT MATTER YO ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION

10/19/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER (JOINT) TO SUBMIT MATTER YO ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Statement - NOTICE [JOINT] STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT REGARDING ARBITRATION

4/29/2021: Status Conference Statement - NOTICE [JOINT] STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT REGARDING ARBITRATION

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING ARBITRATION

1/26/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING ARBITRATION

Request for Dismissal

8/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ruby O Mayen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference Statement ([JOINT] REGARDING ARBITRATION); Filed by Fh & Hf- Torrance I, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING ARBITRATION); Filed by Ruby O Mayen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order ((Joint) to Submit Matter yo Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Arbitration); Filed by Fh & Hf- Torrance I, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Ruby O Mayen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • Docketat 3:09 PM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re C.C.P. 170.6)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Ruby O Mayen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ((1st)); Filed by Ruby O Mayen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re C.C.P. 170.6) of 09/04/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ruby O Mayen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ruby O Mayen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ruby O Mayen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FH & HF-TORRANCE I LLC DBA SUNNYSIDE NURSING CENTER is a litigant