This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 10:48:13 (UTC).

RUBY MAYEN VS FH & HF-TORRANCE I, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 RUBY MAYEN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FH HF-TORRANCE I, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4296

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAYEN RUBY

Defendant

FH & HF-TORRANCE I LLC DBA SUNNYSIDE NURSING AND POST-ACUTE CARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CUSTIS KEITH A.

CUSTIS KEITH

Defendant Attorney

CHIU STACEY G

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/14/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/22/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Related Case

4/26/2021: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

5/7/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Request for Dismissal

6/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

6/1/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Notice of Appearance

5/27/2021: Notice of Appearance

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ruby Mayen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Fh & Hf-Torrance I, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Ruby Mayen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case ((Dept. 12 has earliest filed case)); Filed by Ruby Mayen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ruby Mayen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ruby Mayen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ruby Mayen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FH & HF-TORRANCE I LLC DBA SUNNYSIDE NURSING CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUSTIS KEITH A.