This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2020 at 00:38:07 (UTC).

RUBIN BRYANT VS DEVRY UNIVERSITY, INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 RUBIN BRYANT filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DEVRY UNIVERSITY, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RANDOLPH A. ROGERS and WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8325

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RANDOLPH A. ROGERS

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRYANT RUBIN

Defendants

DEVRY UNIVERSITY PALMDALE CENTER

LEE KAREN

SHAW ASIF

DEVRY INC.

DEVRY EDUCATION GROUP INC.

DEVRY UNIVERSITY INC.

ADTALEM GLOBAL EDUCATION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GORDON ROGER L.

GORDON JUSTIN L.

GORDON JUSTIN LEE

GORDON ROGER LEIF

MERLISS JOSHUA MARK

STERN GARY NEAL

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM

CROWTHER ROBYN CARRICO

WEBB JOO CHA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))

8/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 08/13/2019

8/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 08/13/2019

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/1/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF RUBIN BRYANTS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/29/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF RUBIN BRYANTS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF RUBIN BRYANTS CONDITIONAL NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/29/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF RUBIN BRYANTS CONDITIONAL NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) - MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT INITIAL PLEADING) PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/24/2019: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) - MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT INITIAL PLEADING) PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL GARY N. STERN, AND NOTICE OF DISSASOCIATION OF COUNSEL JOSHUA MERLISS

3/25/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL GARY N. STERN, AND NOTICE OF DISSASOCIATION OF COUNSEL JOSHUA MERLISS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEVEN D WHEELESS

4/2/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEVEN D WHEELESS

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint Second

2/25/2019: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint Second

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/30/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Stipulation - No Order - Stipulation - No Order REGARDING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/22/2019: Stipulation - No Order - Stipulation - No Order REGARDING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

1/8/2019: Case Management Statement

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

1/11/2019: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Proof of Personal Service

1/16/2019: Proof of Personal Service

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/28/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

9/28/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/1/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • Hearing08/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • Hearing08/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Order Continuing Trial and Related Deadlines); Filed by Devry University, Inc. (Defendant); Karen Lee (Defendant); Asif Shaw (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI) (and related deadlines); Filed by Devry University, Inc. (Defendant); Karen Lee (Defendant); Asif Shaw (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (To Continue Trial and Deadlines); Filed by Devry University, Inc. (Defendant); Karen Lee (Defendant); Asif Shaw (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint); Filed by Devry University, Inc. (Defendant); Karen Lee (Defendant); Asif Shaw (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Docketat 4:19 PM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADTALEM GLOBAL EDUCATION INC. FKA DEVRY EDUCATION GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where DEVRY UNIVERSITY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MERLISS JOSHUA M.