This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/31/2023 at 16:56:19 (UTC).

RUBEN ROY RUIZ, JR., ET AL. VS AVORS MEDICAL GROUP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 RUBEN ROY RUIZ, JR , filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against AVORS MEDICAL GROUP,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0912

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUIZ JR. RUBEN ROY

RUIZ KATHA

Defendants

AVORS MEDICAL GROUP

GOLDEN M.D. DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUNCH BRUCE M.

Defendant Attorney

TROTTER MICHAEL JOHN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/4/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/4/2022: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/2/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/28/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/12/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2025
  • Hearing11/04/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2024
  • Hearing01/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2023
  • Hearing12/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 01/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: David Golden, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: David Golden, M.D. (Defendant); As to: Ruben Roy Ruiz, Jr. (Plaintiff); Katha Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ruben Roy Ruiz, Jr. (Plaintiff); Katha Ruiz (Plaintiff); As to: AVORS Medical Group (Defendant); Service Date: 11/28/2022; Service Cost: 119.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ruben Roy Ruiz, Jr. (Plaintiff); Katha Ruiz (Plaintiff); As to: AVORS Medical Group (Defendant); Service Date: 11/23/2022; Service Cost: 129.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Ruben Roy Ruiz, Jr. (Plaintiff); Katha Ruiz (Plaintiff); As to: David Golden, M.D. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/28/2022; Service Cost: 89.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/04/2025 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael C. Kelley in Department A15 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ruben Roy Ruiz, Jr. (Plaintiff); Katha Ruiz (Plaintiff); As to: AVORS Medical Group (Defendant); David Golden, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ruben Roy Ruiz, Jr. (Plaintiff); Katha Ruiz (Plaintiff); As to: AVORS Medical Group (Defendant); David Golden, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ruben Roy Ruiz, Jr. (Plaintiff); Katha Ruiz (Plaintiff); As to: AVORS Medical Group (Defendant); David Golden, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less