This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/26/2023 at 07:36:18 (UTC).

RUBEN RODRIGUEZ VS WEST VALLEY BOYS & GIRLS CLUB, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 RUBEN RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WEST VALLEY BOYS GIRLS CLUB, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0167

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ RUBEN

Defendants

BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES INC.

BOYS & GIRLS CLUB OF THE WEST VALLEY

WEST VALLEY BOYS & GIRLS CLUB INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAURIGUE MICHAEL J.

Defendant Attorneys

DALBY DAVID I.

GOLDSTEIN SARAH K.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE (RESOLVE LA EMPLOYMENT MSC))

9/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE (RESOLVE LA EMPLOYMENT MSC))

Joint Status Conference Report

9/6/2023: Joint Status Conference Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT PLAINTIFF RUBEN RODRIGUEZS AND DEFENDANT WEST VALLEY BOYS & GIRLS CLUB, INC.S JOINT STATUS REPORT

6/2/2023: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT PLAINTIFF RUBEN RODRIGUEZS AND DEFENDANT WEST VALLEY BOYS & GIRLS CLUB, INC.S JOINT STATUS REPORT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

10/5/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/5/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT WEST VALLEY BOYS & GIRLS CLUBS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

10/3/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT WEST VALLEY BOYS & GIRLS CLUBS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

9/29/2022: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/16/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/12/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

8/8/2022: Answer

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

8/8/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Personal Service

7/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/8/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2024
  • Hearing02/01/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Post-Mediation Status Conference (Resolve LA Employment MSC))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference (Resolve LA Employment MSC) scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 updated: Result Date to 09/13/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketJoint Status Conference Report; Filed by: Ruben Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference (Resolve LA Employment MSC) scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 updated: Result Date to 06/07/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketJoint Status Conference Report PLAINTIFF RUBEN RODRIGUEZS AND DEFENDANT WEST VALLEY BOYS & GIRLS CLUB, INC.s JOINT STATUS REPORT; Filed by: West Valley Boys & Girls Club, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketAddress for Michael J. Jaurigue (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ruben Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ruben Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: West Valley Boys & Girls Club, Inc. (Defendant); Boys & Girls Club of the West Valley (Defendant); Barrett Business Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: RUBEN RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: WEST VALLEY BOYS & GIRLS CLUB, INC. (Defendant); BOYS & GIRLS CLUB OF THE WEST VALLEY (Defendant); BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 17 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less