This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2023 at 20:07:36 (UTC).

RUBEN LUNA VS CAR TOYS, INC. A WASHINGTON CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 RUBEN LUNA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CAR TOYS, INC A WASHINGTON CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1029

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUNA RUBEN

Defendants

CAR TOYS INC. A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAZANDJIAN HAIG B

Defendant Attorney

LAVI RACHAEL

 

Court Documents

Answer

1/13/2022: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO STAY CASE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

3/28/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO STAY CASE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Complaint

12/8/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE;)

1/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY RE WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC, AND AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS RE WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC

1/30/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY RE WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC, AND AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS RE WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/9/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/31/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO ARBITRATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

9/6/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO ARBITRATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SUPREME COURT RULING ON VIKING RIVER CR...)

7/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SUPREME COURT RULING ON VIKING RIVER CR...)

Notice of Related Case

1/13/2022: Notice of Related Case

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

12/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • Hearing07/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department L at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 04/06/2023 at 09:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department L - Hon. Wesley L. Hsueffective 03/02/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department L - Hon. Wesley L. Hsueffective 03/02/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department L - Hon. Wesley L. Hsueffective 03/02/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department L - Hon. Wesley L. Hsueffective 03/02/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: RUBEN LUNA (Plaintiff); As to: WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC, a Washington Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 12/14/2021; Service Cost: 59.99; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: RUBEN LUNA (Plaintiff); As to: CAR TOYS, INC. a Washington Corporation (Defendant); WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC, a Washington Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: RUBEN LUNA (Plaintiff); As to: CAR TOYS, INC. a Washington Corporation (Defendant); WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC, a Washington Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RUBEN LUNA (Plaintiff); As to: CAR TOYS, INC. a Washington Corporation (Defendant); WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC, a Washington Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Peter A. Hernandez in Department O Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less