This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 05:40:52 (UTC).

RUBEN JUAREZ VS SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC., A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 RUBEN JUAREZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC , A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8691

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUAREZ RUBEN

Defendant

SUBARU OF AMERICA INC. A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMANO MARK

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/20/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

11/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

11/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • Hearing02/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ruben Juarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ruben Juarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ruben Juarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ruben Juarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROMANO MARK