This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2023 at 18:09:40 (UTC).

RUBEN GUZMAN VS CALPORTLAND COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 RUBEN GUZMAN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CALPORTLAND COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS W. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5839

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DOUGLAS W. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUZMAN RUBEN

Defendant

CALPORTLAND COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KINGERY NATHAN

Defendant Attorney

GRASU VICKIE V

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2024
  • Hearing07/08/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2024
  • Hearing06/24/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Calportland Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketJury Trial 5 day est. scheduled for 07/08/2024 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/24/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68 updated: Result Date to 02/17/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Ruben Guzman (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Calportland Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Ruben Guzman (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Douglas W. Stern in Department 68 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketAddress for Nathan Kingery (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ruben Guzman (Plaintiff); As to: Calportland Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ruben Guzman (Plaintiff); As to: Calportland Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less