This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 01:42:55 (UTC).

RUBEN GARCIA VS BRIAN MINORU MORITA ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by RUBEN GARCIA against BRIAN MINORU MORITA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0833

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

GARCIA RUBEN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

MORITA BRIAN MINORU

MORITA MARIA

Other

BISH MINDY S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL DEPOSIT

4/9/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

DEMAND FOF JURY TRIAL

4/9/2018: DEMAND FOF JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

4/9/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

4/9/2018: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/16/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

8/28/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

5/30/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Association of Attorney

3/15/2018: Association of Attorney

SUMMONS

1/19/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

1/19/2018: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Brian Minoru Morita (Defendant); Maria Morita (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Ruben Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Ruben Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Brian Minoru Morita (Defendant); Maria Morita (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Brian Minoru Morita (Defendant); Maria Morita (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Brian Minoru Morita (Defendant); Maria Morita (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Brian Minoru Morita (Defendant); Maria Morita (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Association of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by Ruben Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ruben Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ruben Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Ruben Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC690833    Hearing Date: February 05, 2020    Dept: 29

Garcia v. Morita, et al.

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff Ruben Garcia is GRANTED. Counsel has complied with the requirements of Cal Rules of Court 3.1362. This ruling is not effective until proof of service of the order on Plaintiff is filed in this action. Until then, counsel continues to be counsel of record. Cal Rules of Court 3.1362(e).

Moving party is ordered to give notice.