This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 07:14:08 (UTC).

RUBEN DE JESUS, ET AL. VS STAY GREEN INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 RUBEN DE JESUS, filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against STAY GREEN INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LIA MARTIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9165

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LIA MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DE JESUS RUBEN

GARCIA JUAN ANDRES

RENDON LORENZO

Defendant

STAY GREEN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHIANG KEVIN W.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/10/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/10/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/24/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/24/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Case Management Statement

10/31/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

10/31/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

11/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

1/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • Hearing05/03/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • Hearing05/03/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • Hearing05/03/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/03/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/03/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/03/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/03/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 05/03/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/03/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 05/03/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/03/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stay Green Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Stay Green Inc., a California corporation to Stay Green Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/07/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lia Martin in Department 16 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ruben De Jesus (Plaintiff); Juan Andres Garcia (Plaintiff); Lorenzo Rendon (Plaintiff); As to: Stay Green Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ruben De Jesus (Plaintiff); Juan Andres Garcia (Plaintiff); Lorenzo Rendon (Plaintiff); As to: Stay Green Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ruben De Jesus (Plaintiff); Juan Andres Garcia (Plaintiff); Lorenzo Rendon (Plaintiff); As to: Stay Green Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAY GREEN INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHIANG, KEVIN