This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2021 at 17:52:10 (UTC).

RUBEN BARAJAS,, BY AND THROUGH HIS ATTORNEY-IN-FACT, SUZIE BARAJAS VS EMANATE HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 RUBEN BARAJAS,, BY AND THROUGH HIS ATTORNEY-IN-FACT, SUZIE BARAJAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EMANATE HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2790

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARAJAS RUBEN BY AND THROUGH HIS ATTORNEY-IN-FACT SUZIE BARAJAS

Defendant

EMANATE HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER DBA EMANATE HEALTH INTER-COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PECK SPENCER E.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

6/24/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES RUBEN BARAJA

6/18/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES RUBEN BARAJA

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/18/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • Hearing08/25/2021 at 09:15 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by RUBEN BARAJAS,, by and through his Attorney-In-Fact, Suzie Barajas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RUBEN BARAJAS,, by and through his Attorney-In-Fact, Suzie Barajas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (RUBEN BARAJA); Filed by RUBEN BARAJAS,, by and through his Attorney-In-Fact, Suzie Barajas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RUBEN BARAJAS,, by and through his Attorney-In-Fact, Suzie Barajas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RUBEN BARAJAS,, by and through his Attorney-In-Fact, Suzie Barajas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMANATE HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PECK SPENCER ELIOT