This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2021 at 13:55:44 (UTC).

RST INVESTMENTS, LLC VS JOCELYN YOUNG

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 RST INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JOCELYN YOUNG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0469

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RST INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

YOUNG JOCELYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRICKLAND MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/28/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/29/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

7/26/2021: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Lis Pendens

9/2/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/13/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

10/18/2021: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • Hearing10/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Hearing10/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by RST INVESTMENTS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by RST INVESTMENTS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by RST INVESTMENTS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by RST INVESTMENTS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RST INVESTMENTS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RST INVESTMENTS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RST INVESTMENTS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRICKLAND MICHELLE