This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/17/2022 at 07:25:39 (UTC).

RREEF AMERICA REIT II CORP. DD A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS JESSICA DE LA ROSA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 RREEF AMERICA REIT II CORP DD A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against JESSICA DE LA ROSA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0204

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RREEF AMERICA REIT II CORP. DD A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendants

DE LA ROSA JESSICA

DE LA ROSA STERVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS CHRIS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (STERVE DE LA ROSA)

3/25/2022: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (STERVE DE LA ROSA)

Complaint

3/25/2022: Complaint

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

3/25/2022: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

3/25/2022: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (JESSICA DE LA ROSA)

3/25/2022: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (JESSICA DE LA ROSA)

Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

3/25/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • Hearing05/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RREEF America REIT II Corp. DD A Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by RREEF America REIT II Corp. DD A Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RREEF America REIT II Corp. DD A Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Jessica De La Rosa)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Sterve De La Rosa)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RREEF America REIT II Corp. DD A Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RREEF AMERICA REIT II CORP. BBB A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS