This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/25/2021 at 07:03:33 (UTC).

R&R SURGICAL INSTITUTE, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION VS AETNA, INC., A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 R R SURGICAL INSTITUTE, AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AETNA, INC , A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0036

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R&R SURGICAL INSTITUTE AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION

Defendant

AETNA INC. A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WHITE ALYSSA MILMAN

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

1/19/2021: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/15/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • Hearing05/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Hearing05/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by R&R Surgical Institute, an unincorporated association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by R&R Surgical Institute, an unincorporated association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by R&R Surgical Institute, an unincorporated association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AETNA INC. A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE ALYSSA MILMAN