This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2020 at 00:27:01 (UTC).

ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATION ET AL VS RAINES

Case Summary

On 07/25/2018 ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAINES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4802

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING

SILVER STATE BROADCASTING LLC

GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING LLC

STOLZ EDWARD R. II

Respondents and Defendants

RAINES FELMAN LLP

GEBELIN STEVEN

FELDMAN MILES J.

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

ADLI LAW GROUP P.C.

ADLI DARIUSH GHAFFAR

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

COLE JONATHAN B. ESQ.

COLE JONATHAN BERRES

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF EDWARD R. STOLZ II'S COMPLAINT

7/25/2018: PLAINTIFF EDWARD R. STOLZ II'S COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68608(B) $

1/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68608(B) $

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OR STATUS OF ARBITRATION)

1/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OR STATUS OF ARBITRATION)

Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION

1/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

4/12/2019: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

4/12/2019: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

4/12/2019: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

4/15/2019: Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Ruling

5/15/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STRIKING THE COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO...)

5/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STRIKING THE COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO...)

Proof of Personal Service

4/2/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR SILVER STATE BROADCASTING LLC AND ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATION

4/4/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR SILVER STATE BROADCASTING LLC AND ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATION

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSED FOR GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING AND EDWARD R. STOLZ II

4/5/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSED FOR GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING AND EDWARD R. STOLZ II

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

4/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

4/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal or Status of Arbitration) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketNotice (Amended Notice of Dismissal of Action); Filed by Raines Felman LLP (Defendant); Miles J. Feldman (Defendant); Steven Gebelin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68608(b) $); Filed by Raines Felman LLP (Defendant); Miles J. Feldman (Defendant); Steven Gebelin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal or Status of Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Striking the Complaint for failure to have counsel to represent the corporations) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Striking the Complaint for failure to have counsel to represent the corporations) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Striking the Complaint for failure to...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Raines Felman LLP (Defendant); Miles J. Feldman (Defendant); Steven Gebelin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Edward R. II Stolz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Royce International Broadcasting (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Royce International Broadcasting (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Royce International Broadcasting (Plaintiff); Silver State Broadcasting, LLC (Plaintiff); Golden State Broadcasting, LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF EDWARD R. STOLZ II'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less