This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2023 at 02:31:48 (UTC).

ROYAL UNITED GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF CARRIE CHAPMAN, DECEDENT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 ROYAL UNITED GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF CARRIE CHAPMAN, DECEDENT,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7455

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROYAL UNITED GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THIS COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO THE PLAINTIFF'S TITLE OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO

THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF CARRIE CHAPMAN DECEDENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRITER COURTNEY F.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING - OTHER RE: EVIDENTIARY HEARING WITH RESPECT TO PLAIN...) OF 09/01/2023

9/1/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING - OTHER RE: EVIDENTIARY HEARING WITH RESPECT TO PLAIN...) OF 09/01/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER RE: EVIDENTIARY HEARING WITH RESPECT TO PLAIN...)

9/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER RE: EVIDENTIARY HEARING WITH RESPECT TO PLAIN...)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOHN HEBDA, TITLE EXAMINER, IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

8/15/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOHN HEBDA, TITLE EXAMINER, IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION AMENDED DECLARATION OF SIRDAR DOST DURANI, DESIGNATED WITNESSES FOR ROYAL UNITED GROUP, LLC, IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

8/15/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION AMENDED DECLARATION OF SIRDAR DOST DURANI, DESIGNATED WITNESSES FOR ROYAL UNITED GROUP, LLC, IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION AMENDED DECLARATION OF COURTNEY F. WRITER IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

8/15/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION AMENDED DECLARATION OF COURTNEY F. WRITER IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE AMENDED DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING WITNESS LIST

8/15/2023: Notice - NOTICE AMENDED DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING WITNESS LIST

Notice - NOTICE AMENDED DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING EXHIBIT LIST

8/15/2023: Notice - NOTICE AMENDED DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING EXHIBIT LIST

Request for Judicial Notice

8/15/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

Summary of the Case

8/15/2023: Summary of the Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT HEARING)

6/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT HEARING)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE (ADRA L. PITTMAN, CSR #13298)

6/26/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE (ADRA L. PITTMAN, CSR #13298)

Request for Dismissal

6/12/2023: Request for Dismissal

Witness List

6/12/2023: Witness List

Exhibit List

6/12/2023: Exhibit List

Request for Judicial Notice

6/12/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/12/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/12/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SIRDAR DOST DURANI, DESIGNATED WITNESSES FOR ROYAL UNITED GROUP, LLC, IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

6/12/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SIRDAR DOST DURANI, DESIGNATED WITNESSES FOR ROYAL UNITED GROUP, LLC, IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2023
  • Hearing09/08/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing - Other Re: Evidentiary Hearing with respect to Plaintiff's Request for Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • DocketHearing - Other Re: Evidentiary Hearing with respect to Plaintiff's Request for Default Judgment scheduled for 09/08/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing - Other Re: Evidentiary Hearing with respect to Plaintiff's Request for Default Judgment scheduled for 09/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 09/08/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing - Other Re: Evidentiary Hearing with respect to Plain...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other Re: Evidentiary Hearing with respect to Plain...) of 09/01/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketDeclaration AMENDED DECLARATION OF SIRDAR DOST DURANI, DESIGNATED WITNESSES FOR ROYAL UNITED GROUP, LLC, IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Filed by: ROYAL UNITED GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by: ROYAL UNITED GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF JOHN HEBDA, TITLE EXAMINER, IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Filed by: ROYAL UNITED GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketDeclaration AMENDED DECLARATION OF COURTNEY F. WRITER IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Filed by: ROYAL UNITED GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketNotice AMENDED DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING WITNESS LIST; Filed by: ROYAL UNITED GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF CARRIE CHAPMAN, decedent (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketAddress for Courtney F. Writer (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William F. Fahey in Department 69 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ROYAL UNITED GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF CARRIE CHAPMAN, decedent (Defendant); ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THIS COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO THE PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ROYAL UNITED GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF CARRIE CHAPMAN, decedent (Defendant); ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THIS COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO THE PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ROYAL UNITED GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF CARRIE CHAPMAN, decedent (Defendant); ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THIS COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO THE PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less