This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2022 at 15:47:33 (UTC).

ROY VIRKLER VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2022 ROY VIRKLER filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0591

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIRKLER ROY

Defendants

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

MEDRANO KRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARUSO MARY L. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2024
  • Hearing12/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2024
  • Hearing06/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2024
  • Hearing06/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Roy Virkler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Roy Virkler (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant); Kristina Medrano (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Roy Virkler (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less