This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2019 at 04:00:35 (UTC).

ROY MODESTO, INC. VS SHAFI AHMED, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/17/2018 ROY MODESTO, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SHAFI AHMED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN P. PFAHLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8446

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROY MODESTO INC.

Defendants

KHATRI ANIL

AHMED SHAFI

KHATRI BROTHERS L.P.

KHATRI JAWAHARLAL

UNITED RESORTS LLC

KHATRI INC.

KHATRI INC

KHATRI BROTHERS L.P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROY RAJ D.

ROY RAJ DIPANKAR

 

Court Documents

Unknown

6/8/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

5/30/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

5/29/2018: Unknown

Notice of Settlement

5/24/2018: Notice of Settlement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/10/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/2/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/2/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/2/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/2/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/2/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Unknown

4/17/2018: Unknown

Summons

4/17/2018: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/17/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice

4/17/2018: Notice

Unknown

4/17/2018: Unknown

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F49; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-15 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F49; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-05-30 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Roy Modesto, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Partial Dismissal; Filed by Roy Modesto, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Roy Modesto, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Roy Modesto, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Roy Modesto, INC. (Plaintiff); KHATRI, INC. (DISMISSED) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Roy Modesto, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Roy Modesto, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Roy Modesto, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Roy Modesto, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Roy Modesto, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROY RAJ D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROY RAJ DIPANKAR