This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2019 at 00:36:14 (UTC).

ROY MEDICAL GROUP, INC. VS. GURDEEP SETHI, NP

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 ROY MEDICAL GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GURDEEP SETHI, NP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7854

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC.

Defendant

SETHI GURDEEP N.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROY RAJ D.

PRIETO PAMELA TAMMY AQUINO

Defendant Attorney

RUPAL MANDEEP SINGH

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/10/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice

7/10/2017: Notice

Unknown

7/10/2017: Unknown

Notice

11/2/2017: Notice

Unknown

11/2/2017: Unknown

Notice

11/2/2017: Notice

Case Management Statement

11/30/2017: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

12/12/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

1/8/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

1/22/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/28/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

4/6/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

4/13/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/28/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/9/2019: Minute Order

Notice

3/20/2019: Notice

Declaration

6/5/2019: Declaration

Ex Parte Application

6/5/2019: Ex Parte Application

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DR. ROSALINDAA. ROY, OR ALTERNATIVEL YAN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON A MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Declaration (OF CHRISTIAN H. NA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DR. ROSALINDAA. ROY, OR ALTERNATIVELY AN ORDER SHORTENING TIlVfEON A MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS); Filed by Gurdeep N.P. Sethi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Ex Parte Application to Compel the Deposition of Dr. Rosalinda Roy, or Alternatively, an Order Shortening Time on a Motion to Compel and for Sanctions; Filed by Gurdeep N.P. Sethi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Deposition and Request for Production of Documents); Filed by Gurdeep N.P. Sethi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • at 08:35 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (To Continue Final Status Conference, Trial Dates and Corresponding Dates) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • at 3:27 PM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Minute Order ((NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Minute Order ((HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT GURDEEP SETHI FO...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2017
  • Notice (RE: Continuance of Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Cross-Compl fld- No Summons Issued; Filed by Gurdeep N.P. Sethi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Motion; Filed by Gurdeep N.P. Sethi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Notice (RE: Continuance of Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Gurdeep N.P. Sethi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Notice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Roy Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Gurdeep N.P. Sethi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUPAL MANDEEP SINGH