This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2019 at 01:11:25 (UTC).

ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC VS COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP

Case Summary

On 01/25/2018 ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1616

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

QUALIFIED HEALTHCARE INC

COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

ROY RAJ D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/13/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/1/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS

1/25/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

1/25/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Roy Medical Group Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Roy Medical Group Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Roy Medical Group Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Roy Medical Group Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROY RAJ D.