This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 05:52:11 (UTC).

ROY MEDICAL GROUP, INC. VS. CARE 1ST HEALTH PLAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2017 ROY MEDICAL GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against CARE 1ST HEALTH PLAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7708

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA

BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA LIFE & HEALTH

CARE 1ST HEALTH PLAN

ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC.

QUALIFIED HEALTHCARE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGELLO FRANK P.

Other Attorneys

PRIETO PAMELA TAMMY AQUINO

STEINBERG CRAIG S

KENNADAY LEAVITT & OWENSBY

ROY RAJ D.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

9/12/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/20/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

10/16/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

12/7/2017: Unknown

Unknown

1/19/2018: Unknown

Unknown

4/3/2018: Unknown

Unknown

4/24/2018: Unknown

Unknown

4/25/2018: Unknown

Case Management Statement

5/15/2018: Case Management Statement

Unknown

5/30/2018: Unknown

Unknown

8/30/2018: Unknown

Reply

9/25/2018: Reply

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/5/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Reply

11/5/2018: Reply

Minute Order

1/18/2019: Minute Order

Reply

2/11/2019: Reply

Declaration

3/11/2019: Declaration

Ex Parte Application

3/18/2019: Ex Parte Application

235 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Compliance with Subpoena and Production of Documents) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • at 08:35 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • at 08:32 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash (CFC's Deposition Subpoena for Personal Appearance and Production of Documents and Things to Raj D. Roy, Esq, and/or in the alternative, Motion for Protective Order) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • at 08:32 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash (Notice of Deposition) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • at 08:32 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by ROY MEDICAL GROUP, INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
285 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2017
  • Demurrer; Filed by COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Summons; Filed by COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued; Filed by COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by ROY MEDICAL GROUP, INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by ROY MEDICAL GROUP, INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ROY MEDICAL GROUP, INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA PROMISE HEALTH PLAN A NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION AKA CARE1ST PARTNER PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BLUE SHIELD OF CA LIFE & HEALTH INS. CO. is a litigant