This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:55:43 (UTC).

ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC ET AL VS EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDI

Case Summary

On 11/17/2017 ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3549

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

ROY MEDICAL GROUP INCORPORATION

MDKIDS CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA INCORPORATI

ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC.

MDKIDS CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA INC.

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GEVORKYAN HAYK

MEJIA ARACELI

DOES 1 TO 100

L.A. CARE HEALTH PLAN

EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP

SYNERMED (DOE 1)

SYNERMED

EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDIAL GROUP INC.

EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP INC.

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff

MEJIA ARACELI

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC.

MDKIDS CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

ROY RAJ D. ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

KEVIN E. GILBERT

PURITSKY COURTNEY L.

GILBERT KEVIN E.

MCMAHON RAYMOND J.

GRODSKY ALLEN B.

 

Court Documents

Status Report

6/3/2019: Status Report

Request for Dismissal

6/12/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

6/18/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

6/27/2019: Notice of Ruling

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ARACELI MEJIA COUNTER CLAIM TO: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

2/26/2018: ARACELI MEJIA COUNTER CLAIM TO: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

2/28/2018: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP INC'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY

3/12/2018: PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP INC'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY

REPLY RE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AS TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO STAY STATE COURT ACTION SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANT EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

3/15/2018: REPLY RE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AS TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO STAY STATE COURT ACTION SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANT EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

3/15/2018: PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

JOINT NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE ON EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

3/19/2018: JOINT NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE ON EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

4/11/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

4/11/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

4/11/2018: DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANTS HAYK GEVORKYAN AND SYNERMED TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF DAVID KLEHM RE: CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ?430.414

4/11/2018: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANTS HAYK GEVORKYAN AND SYNERMED TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF DAVID KLEHM RE: CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ?430.414

PLAINTIFFS' ANSWER TO ARACELI MEJIA'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/11/2018: PLAINTIFFS' ANSWER TO ARACELI MEJIA'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

4/12/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

4/26/2018: Minute Order

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Roy Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); MDKids Care Medical Group, IPA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Status Conference (Regarding Arbitration) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Regarding Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Roy Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); MDKids Care Medical Group, IPA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Roy Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Employee Health Systems Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (at November 26, 2018 Status Conference); Filed by Employee Health Systems Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Status Conference (Regarding Arbitration) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Status Conference Regarding Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Employee Health Systems Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Roy Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); MDKids Care Medical Group, IPA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Roy Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); MDKids Care Medical Group, IPA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Roy Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); MDKids Care Medical Group, IPA, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SYNERMED INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP INC . is a litigant

Latest cases where L.A. CARE HEALTH PLAN is a litigant