This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2019 at 00:31:32 (UTC).

ROXANNE JASPER VS BENJAMIN HALPERN

Case Summary

On 04/18/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by ROXANNE JASPER against BENJAMIN HALPERN in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2527

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

JASPER ROXANNE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

HALPERN BENJAMIN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

4/18/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

4/18/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash (Deposition Subpoenas and for Monetary Sanctions) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by Benjamin Halpern (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Opposition (to Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash or Modify Deposition Subpoenas; and Request for Monetary Sanctions; Memorandum of Points Authorities; And Declaration of Ankineh Zadoorian); Filed by Benjamin Halpern (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by Benjamin Halpern (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by Roxanne jasper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Notice (of Filing of Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas and Notice of Stay); Filed by Roxanne jasper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Roxanne jasper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash or Modify Deposition Subpoenas; Request for Monetary Sanctions of $9,256.65 from Defendant and His Counsel; Filed by Roxanne jasper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by Roxanne jasper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Benjamin Halpern (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Roxanne jasper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Roxanne jasper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC702527    Hearing Date: December 30, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

On April 18, 2018, plaintiff Roxanne Jasper filed this action against defendant Benjamin Halpern for injuries and damages arising from a July 20, 2016 motor vehicle collision. On August 14, 2019, Plaintiff served Supplemental Demand for Production, Set 1 and Supplemental Interrogatories, Set 1 on Defendant. Defendant failed to respond. Plaintiff request responses several times. On November 13, 2019, Plaintiff filed motions to compel responses. Defendant served verified responses on November 26, 2019. Therefore the motions are MOOT.

Plaintiff requests sanctions in the total amount of $9,898.90, based on an hourly rate of $675 per hour. That amount is excessive for two simple discovery motions. The amount includes duplicative time for attending a hearing, phone calls and emails. Also, a junior attorney billing at a lower hourly rate should prepare basic discovery motions. The typical rate for simple motions to compel is in the $200-$250 per hour range. Plaintiff’s request for monetary sanctions is GRANTED and imposed against Defendant and counsel of record, jointly and severally, in the amount of $870.00, to be paid within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.