This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 05:13:51 (UTC).

ROXANN ROBERTSON VS CITY OF SAN GABRIEL ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/24/2017 ROXANN ROBERTSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF SAN GABRIEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0899

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ROBERTSON ROXANN

Defendants and Respondents

DOE DEFENDANT

SAN GABRIEL CITY OF

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

DOES 1-100 INCLUSIVE

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF SAN GABRIEL

Not Classified By Court

RKA CONSULTING GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GHERMEZIAN RAYMOND ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GROSSBERG SCOTT J. ESQ.

VALENCIA KATRINA

OBERLE BRYAN C.

RUTTER MARK D.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/25/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

8/27/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/22/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Judicial Notice

10/30/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/30/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Unknown

11/7/2018: Unknown

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/8/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Demurrer

1/8/2019: Demurrer

Opposition

1/23/2019: Opposition

Notice

1/29/2019: Notice

Notice of Ruling

2/1/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

2/6/2019: Notice of Ruling

Demurrer

3/29/2019: Demurrer

Notice of Ruling

5/3/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

5/9/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

5/13/2019: Notice of Ruling

Demurrer

6/12/2019: Demurrer

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/4/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by City of San Gabriel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by City of San Gabriel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Complaint (2nd); Filed by Roxann Robertson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Amended Complaint (2nd); Filed by Roxann Robertson (Plaintiff); Roxann Robertson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by San Gabriel, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Roxann Robertson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Continue Defendant City of San Gabriel's Motion for Summary Judgment) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue Defe...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Continue Defendant City of San Gabriel's Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by Roxann Robertson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Opposition (by City of San Gabriel to Ex Parte Applicaton Filed by Plaintiff); Filed by San Gabriel, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Answer; Filed by San Gabriel, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • ANSWER BY CITY OF SAN GABRIEL TO COMPLAINT OF ROXANN ROBERTSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Complaint NOTICE OF REJECTION-REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AND OLD RFP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Roxann Robertson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Roxann Robertson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet NOTICE OF REJECTION-REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AND OLD RFP

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC680899    Hearing Date: February 07, 2020    Dept: E

(1) MOTIONS TO COMPEL INITIAL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR DISCOVERY; AND

(2) MOTION TO DEEM TRUTH OF ALL MATTERS SPECIFIED IN REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

Date: 2/7/20

Case: Roxann Robertson et al. v. City of San Gabriel et al. (BC680899)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Because plaintiff Roxann Robertson served responses to the subject discovery after the motions were filed, the Court hereby DENIES as MOOT Defendant RKA Consulting Group’s (1) Motion to Compel Plaintiff Roxann Robertson’s Responses and Responsive Documents to Defendant’s Requests for Production of Documents, Set One, Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Form Interrogatories, Set One; and (2) Motion for Order Deeming the Truth of All Matters Specified in Requests for Admission, Set One, Admitted.

“The court may award sanctions under the Discovery Act in favor of a party who files a motion to compel discovery, even though . . . the requested discovery was provided to the moving party after the motion was filed.” (Cal. Rule of Court 3.1348(a).) For failing to comply with discovery obligations and thereby forcing defendants to file this motion, the court imposes monetary sanctions on plaintiff’s counsel of record in the amount of $943.30 (two hours per motion at $205 per hour, plus $61.65 filing fee per motion), payable to defendant RKA Consulting Group’s counsel forthwith.

Case Number: BC680899    Hearing Date: November 26, 2019    Dept: 5

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

ROXANN ROBERTSON ,

Plaintiff,

v.

CITY OF SAN GABRIEL , et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC680899

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 5 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE NORTH CENTRAL DISTRICT, JUDGE CURTIS A. KIN presiding in DEPT. E of the GLENDALE Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: November 21, 2019 ___________________________

Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court