This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2023 at 09:14:45 (UTC).

ROXANA VARGAS VS CVS PHARMACY, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 ROXANA VARGAS filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CVS PHARMACY, INC , A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0488

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VARGAS ROXANA

Defendants

CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS LLC A CORPORATION

CVS PHARMACY INC. A CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

GARFIELD BEACH CVS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONDLE JAKE P.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/21/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/21/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/21/2023: Complaint

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS LADUREE LOS ANGELES LLC AND FRANCISCO VERANO TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAMINATION, OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO SHO

3/24/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS LADUREE LOS ANGELES LLC AND FRANCISCO VERANO TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAMINATION, OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO SHO

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE TO THE CLERK OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF LOS ANGELES AND TO OTHER PARTIES OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT UNDER 28 U.S.C. 144L(B)

3/27/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE TO THE CLERK OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF LOS ANGELES AND TO OTHER PARTIES OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT UNDER 28 U.S.C. 144L(B)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/3/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

5/2/2023: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2023
  • Hearing10/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • Hearing07/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: Roxana Vargas (Plaintiff); As to: CVS PHARMACY, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Federal Removal scheduled for 10/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Roxana Vargas (Plaintiff); As to: GARFIELD BEACH CVS LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice to the Clerk of the Superior Court of Los Angeles and to Other Parties of Removal to Federal Court Under 28 U.s.c. 144l(B); Filed by: CVS PHARMACY, INC., a corporation (Defendant); As to: Roxana Vargas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Granting Ex Parte Application of Defendants Laduree Los Angeles Llc and Francisco Verano to Compel Plaintiffs Independent Mental Examination, or Alternatively, to Shorten Time; Filed by: CVS PHARMACY, INC., a corporation (Defendant); As to: Roxana Vargas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Roxana Vargas (Plaintiff); As to: CVS PHARMACY, INC., a corporation (Defendant); CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Roxana Vargas (Plaintiff); As to: CVS PHARMACY, INC., a corporation (Defendant); CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC, a corporation (Defendant); DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Roxana Vargas (Plaintiff); As to: CVS PHARMACY, INC., a corporation (Defendant); CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less