Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 05:27:16 (UTC).

ROSINA DISTEFANO VS IPAYMENT OF CALIFORNIA LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 ROSINA DISTEFANO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against IPAYMENT OF CALIFORNIA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIHU M. BERLE and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0362

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIHU M. BERLE

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DISTEFANO ROSINA INDIVIDUALLY AND ON

DISTEFANO ROSINA

Defendants and Respondents

IPAYMENT INC

IPAYMENT OF CALIFORNIA LLC ET AL

DOES 1 TO 100

IPAYMENT OF CALIFORNIA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

AIWAZIAN EDWIN ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

DENBLEYKER KATHERINE CAROL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/5/2018: Complaint

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

2/6/2018: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Ruling

2/13/2018: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/22/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice

8/10/2018: Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/14/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Stipulation and Order

1/7/2019: Stipulation and Order

Unknown

1/23/2019: Unknown

Notice

2/11/2019: Notice

Unknown

3/28/2019: Unknown

Notice

4/15/2019: Notice

Minute Order

1/3/2018: Minute Order

Order

1/9/2018: Order

Complaint

1/12/2018: Complaint

Declaration

1/25/2018: Declaration

Notice of Appearance

11/21/2017: Notice of Appearance

Minute Order

11/9/2017: Minute Order

Order

11/9/2017: Order

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Notice (of Minute Order re Hearing of Petition For Coordination); Filed by IPAYMENT, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Coordination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Petition for Coordination) of 04/10/2019 and Court's Ruling Re Petition for Coordination); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Rosina Distefano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Joint Stipulation to Continue Motion for Class Certification Filing Deadline and Further Status Conference; Filed by Rosina Distefano (Plaintiff); IPAYMENT, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Notice (of Change of Coordination Motion Judge and Hearing Location on Petition for Coordination); Filed by IPAYMENT, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Notice (of Order Assigning Coordination Motion Judge and Setting Date for Hearing); Filed by IPAYMENT, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Notice (of Submission of Petition For Coordination); Filed by IPAYMENT, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2017
  • Order -INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM-CLASS ACTIONS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Minute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rosina Distefano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rosina Distefano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Rosina Distefano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IPayment Inc. is a litigant