This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 15:13:07 (UTC).

ROSETTA RODRIGUEZ VS CITY OF BELLFLOWER ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/04/2017 ROSETTA RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF BELLFLOWER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5684

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

RODRIGUEZ ROSETTA

JOHNSON PAUL L

Defendants and Respondents

EMPIRE TRANSPORTATION INC.

DOES 1 TO 100

BELLFLOWER CITY OF

PERKINS CHANNISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DRAKE BENJAMIN ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

GRIFFIN JOHN T.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAMES

4/16/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAMES

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/27/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Amended Complaint

8/7/2018: Amended Complaint

Complaint

8/7/2018: Complaint

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/7/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/23/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/30/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation and Order

1/4/2019: Stipulation and Order

Answer

1/25/2019: Answer

Stipulation and Order

2/13/2019: Stipulation and Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

12/4/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

12/4/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (Proposed Order And Stipulation To Continue Trial); Filed by Empire Transportation, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Answer (to First Amended Complaint by Defendant Empire Transportation, Inc.); Filed by Empire Transportation, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (to Strike Plaintiff's Punitive Damages Claim in the First Amended Complaint as to Defendant Empire Transportation, Inc.); Filed by Rosetta Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Rosetta Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Paul L Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Empire Transportation, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Rosetta Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Bellflower, City of (Defendant); Empire Transportation, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rosetta Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rosetta Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Rosetta Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELLFLOWER CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where EMPIRE TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRIFFIN JOHN T.