This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2022 at 04:29:55 (UTC).

ROSENTHAL, MARJORIE RUTH - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 ROSENTHAL, MARJORIE RUTH - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOGDANOFF, LEE R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2613

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOGDANOFF, LEE R.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

PRIMACK STACY

ROSENTHAL LISA F.

Decedent

ROSENTHAL MARJORIE RUTH

Not Classified By Court

HUTCHINSON ROBERT F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROSENTHAL LISA FRANCINE

 

Court Documents

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

3/16/2022: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

3/21/2022: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

4/6/2022: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Supplement - Supplemental Declaration Re: Probate Notes

4/18/2022: Supplement - Supplemental Declaration Re: Probate Notes

Proof of Publication

4/22/2022: Proof of Publication

Minute Order

4/21/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Publication - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate (Notices)

4/22/2022: Proof of Publication - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate (Notices)

Will Deposited - 6 pgs - Dated - 04/15/2020

4/22/2022: Will Deposited - 6 pgs - Dated - 04/15/2020

Notice - Notice of Lodging Original Will

4/22/2022: Notice - Notice of Lodging Original Will

Minute Order

6/10/2022: Minute Order

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

6/10/2022: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

6/30/2022: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Will - Admitted

6/10/2022: Will - Admitted

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2023
  • Hearing11/14/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketWill (Admitted )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Probate of Will (Initial) filed on March 16, 2022 by Lisa F. Rosenthal, Stacy Primack. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketWill Deposited (6 pgs - Dated - 04/15/2020 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketSupplement (Supplemental Declaration Re: Probate Notes ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENTHAL LISA F