This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/14/2017 at 13:03:18 (UTC).

ROSENDO GALLARDO VS LASCARIS AND SONS INC

Case Summary

On 05/15/2017 ROSENDO GALLARDO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LASCARIS AND SONS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. RICO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1442

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD E. RICO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GALLARDO RSENDO

Defendants and Respondents

LASCARIS AND SONS INC

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ELDESSOUKY MOHAMED ESQ

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LAU WENDY M.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/10/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMONS

5/15/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BASED UPON: I. DENIAL OF MEAL PERIODS (LAB. CODE SECTIONS 512(A)) & 226.7(B));ETC

5/15/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BASED UPON: I. DENIAL OF MEAL PERIODS (LAB. CODE SECTIONS 512(A)) & 226.7(B));ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/24/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

6/20/2017: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/11/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

9/6/2017: NOTE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order

9/13/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/20/2017: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2017
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2007
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LASCARI'S AND SONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELDESSOUKY MOHAMED