This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2022 at 15:29:48 (UTC).

ROSEMARY BANUELOS VS ALDI, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 ROSEMARY BANUELOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALDI, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7344

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANUELOS ROSEMARY

Defendant

ALDI INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARTER LEE C

Defendant Attorney

AMARKARIAN ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/29/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

1/6/2022: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

1/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

2/1/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/1/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

2/1/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2024
  • Hearing12/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • Hearing06/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • Hearing06/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ALDI, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by ALDI, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by ALDI, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rosemary Banuelos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rosemary Banuelos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rosemary Banuelos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rosemary Banuelos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALDI (FLORIDA) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARTER LEE C. ESQ.