This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2022 at 01:24:00 (UTC).

ROSEMARIE PARADIS GROSS VS MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 ROSEMARIE PARADIS GROSS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3814

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GROSS ROSEMARIE PARADIS

Defendants

MACERICH CERRITOS HOLDINGS LLC

MACERICH CERRITOS LLC

NICK MANAGER

INTERSTATE CLEANING CORPORATION

MACERICH PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC

THE MACERICH COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GERARD JOHN F.

DOMINGO ESQ. MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

12/13/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/26/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/26/2022: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

8/2/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Demand for Jury Trial

8/2/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/2/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2024
  • Hearing11/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • Hearing05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • Hearing05/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by Rosemarie Paradis Gross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Rosemarie Paradis Gross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Rosemarie Paradis Gross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketSummons (on First Amended Complaint); Filed by Rosemarie Paradis Gross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Rosemarie Paradis Gross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rosemarie Paradis Gross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rosemarie Paradis Gross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rosemarie Paradis Gross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Macerich Property Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MACERICH CERRITOS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERSTATE CLEANING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MACERICH is a litigant