This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/09/2020 at 02:23:32 (UTC).

ROSELYN GARCIA VS ROY MEDICAL GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/07/2020 ROSELYN GARCIA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ROY MEDICAL GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7447

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA ROSELYN

Defendant

ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIHU KAVEH SAM

Defendant Attorney

MAGANTE EDZYL JOSEF

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

11/19/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/20/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

11/20/2020: Case Management Statement

Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S OSC RESPONSE

12/2/2020: Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S OSC RESPONSE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/3/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

12/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 12/07/2020, ADDENDUM RE: DISCOVERY

12/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 12/07/2020, ADDENDUM RE: DISCOVERY

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

9/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/25/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

6/5/2020: Answer

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/7/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/11/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/11/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • Hearing03/01/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Hearing02/18/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • Hearing01/05/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 39; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) of 12/07/2020, Addendum Re: Discovery); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Roy Medical Group, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketResponse (Plaintiff's OSC Response); Filed by Roselyn Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Roselyn Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Roy Medical Group, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Roselyn Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Roselyn Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Roselyn Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Roselyn Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAGANTE EDZYL JOSEF GONZALES