This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2020 at 00:20:31 (UTC).

ROSEANN JOANNE ROSE VS 3200 LAKEWOOD L P ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 ROSEANN JOANNE ROSE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 3200 LAKEWOOD L P. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8843

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ROSE ROSEANN JOANNE

ROSE ROSEANN JOE

Respondents and Defendants

REK PROPERTIES LLC

2192 RANCHO AVENUE

WHISPERING FOUNTAINS

AOF/PACIFIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORP.

3200 LAKEWOOD L.P.

DOES 1 TO 100

2192 RANCHO AVENUE LLC

3200 LAKEWOOD L.P.(DBA WHISPERING

FOUNTAINS WHISPERING

3200 LAKEWOOD L.P.DBA WHISPERING

GQ LANDSCAPE CARE INC.

GQ LANDSCAPE CARE INC. DOE 51

GQ LANDSCAPE CARE INC. DOE 1

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

GQ LANDSCAPE CARE INC.

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MARZBAN MICHAEL M. ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

MILLER DELANEY L. ESQ.

LEON LUCIO

MARS MICHAEL STANLEY ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LEON LUCIO

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

9/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/02/2020

9/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/02/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Separate Statement

6/18/2020: Separate Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT GQ LANDSCAPING CARE, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FO...)

3/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT GQ LANDSCAPING CARE, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FO...)

Notice of Ruling

3/18/2020: Notice of Ruling

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/23/2019: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/10/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Personal Service

6/27/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/30/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer - 3200 LAKEWOOD, L.P.; 3200LAKEWOOD, L.P. D.B.A. WHISPERING FOUNTAINS; REK PROPERTIES, LLC; AOF/ PACIFIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORP.; 2192 RANCHO AVENUE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; 2192 RAN

7/12/2018: Answer - 3200 LAKEWOOD, L.P.; 3200LAKEWOOD, L.P. D.B.A. WHISPERING FOUNTAINS; REK PROPERTIES, LLC; AOF/ PACIFIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORP.; 2192 RANCHO AVENUE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; 2192 RAN

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

6/5/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1.) GENERAL NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

6/5/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1.) GENERAL NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by GQ Landscape Care, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Roseann Joe Rose (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal); Filed by Roseann Joe Rose (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docketat 07:32 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/02/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Roseann Joe Rose (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Roseann Joe Rose (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Roseann Joe Rose (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1.) GENERAL NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3200 LAKEWOOD LP is a litigant

Latest cases where AOF PACIFIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEON LUCIO