This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2020 at 01:53:33 (UTC).

ROSE JOHNSON ET AL VS BORROMEO CUARESMA SIRINEO

Case Summary

On 04/02/2018 ROSE JOHNSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BORROMEO CUARESMA SIRINEO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0452

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Cross Defendants and Not Classified By Court

JOHNSON ROSE

REYNOLDS GENEVA

SIRINEO BORROMEO CUARESMA

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

BORROMEO CUARESMA SIRINEO

DOES 1 TO 30

SIRINEO BORROMEO CUARESMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LESSEM JEREMY I. ESQ.

TOOSON JAMAL L ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BORROMEO IRENE G.

BORROMEO IRENE GAVIOLA

BARRENO ALEXANDRA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Request for Refund / Order

11/4/2019: Request for Refund / Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/17/2020

3/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/17/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

2/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Motion to Continue Trial Date

1/9/2020: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/14/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/16/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY; COMPARATIVE CONTRIBUTION AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

5/30/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY; COMPARATIVE CONTRIBUTION AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

Summons on Cross Complaint -

5/30/2018: Summons on Cross Complaint -

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/30/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PLAINTIFF GENEVA REYNOLDS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DEFENDANTS CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/16/2018: PLAINTIFF GENEVA REYNOLDS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DEFENDANTS CROSS-COMPLAINT

SUMMONS -

4/2/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND NEGLIGENCE UNLIMITED JURISDICTION ? CIVIL AMOUNT OF DAMAGES EXCEEDS $25,000.00

4/2/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND NEGLIGENCE UNLIMITED JURISDICTION ? CIVIL AMOUNT OF DAMAGES EXCEEDS $25,000.00

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • Hearing05/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Hearing04/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Docketat 3:45 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF GENEVA REYNOLDS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DEFENDANTS CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Borromeo Cuaresma Sirineo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Borromeo Cuaresma Sirineo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Borromeo Cuaresma Sirineo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY; COMPARATIVE CONTRIBUTION AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rose Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND NEGLIGENCE UNLIMITED JURISDICTION CIVIL AMOUNT OF DAMAGES EXCEEDS $25,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC700452    Hearing Date: February 04, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Plaintiff's counsel moves to continue the trial from February 25, 2020 to April 13, 2020 due to his unavailability.  This case was filed on April 2, 2018, and there has been one continuance.  Defendant did not oppose the motion.  The Court finds good cause for the continuance.  Trial is continued to April 15, 2020, at 8:30 a.m.  The Final Status Conference is continued to April 1, 2020 at 10 a.m.  All dates are based on the new trial date.  The parties are ordered to inform their witnesses, experts, and parties of the new date immediately.  The Court is granting this continuance as requested by the moving party, and not party opposed the motion.  Therefore, the Court presumes the new trial date has been cleared with the parties, counsel, and experts, and grants the continuance in reliance on the implicit representation that the parties, counsel, and experts are available on the date of trial and day-to-day thereafter for the length of the trial plus a five-day trailing period.  No further continuances should be expected.

The moving party is to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.