Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 13:11:55 (UTC).

ROSE HAWKINS, ET AL. VS SAUL MORALES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 ROSE HAWKINS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SAUL MORALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2032

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HAWKINS ROSE AKA ROSE ANN LAVSHAUL

BROWN LAYMON

HAWKINS JOHN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CANAS MARIA

MORALES SAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

NEPOMUCENO ERWIN A.

Other Attorneys

RABINEAU LARRY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

1/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

1/19/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Cross-Complaint

1/19/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

1/19/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

11/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

11/23/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/2/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Hearing05/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Hearing04/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Saul Morales (Defendant); Maria Canas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Saul Morales (Defendant); Maria Canas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Saul Morales (Defendant); Maria Canas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rose Hawkins (Plaintiff); John Hawkins (Plaintiff); Laymon Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rose Hawkins (Plaintiff); John Hawkins (Plaintiff); Laymon Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rose Hawkins (Plaintiff); John Hawkins (Plaintiff); Laymon Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rose Hawkins (Plaintiff); John Hawkins (Plaintiff); Laymon Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less