This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 03:59:44 (UTC).

ROSARIO RODRIGUEZ VS LEVI STRAUSS & CO.

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 ROSARIO RODRIGUEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LEVI STRAUSS CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7537

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ ROSARIO

Defendant

LEVI STRAUSS & CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOUZARI AZAR

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/11/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 12/16/2020

12/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 12/16/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

12/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

12/15/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

12/15/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Status Conference and Order

12/24/2020: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/24/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/3/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Case Management Statement

3/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

3/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Initial Status Conference (***Reassigned from dpt. 40 on 12/15/20***) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rosario Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Rosario Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docketat 07:54 AM in Department 40; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of 12/16/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (filed by plaintiff against the Honorable David Sotelo - Dept. 40); Filed by Rosario Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rosario Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rosario Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rosario Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rosario Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEVI STRAUSS & CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOUZARI AZAR ESQ.