This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2020 at 07:44:16 (UTC).

ROSARIO, MARCO ANTONIO JULIO GABRIEL - GUARDIANSHIP

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 ROSARIO, MARCO ANTONIO JULIO GABRIEL - GUARDIANSHIP was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9826

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROSARIO MARCO ANTONIO JULIO GABRIEL

Not Classified By Court

ROSARIO MARINO GABRIEL

PROBATE INVESTIGATORS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RODRIGUEZ BARBARA MARIA

 

Court Documents

Order - Appointing Guardian - Person only

3/6/2020: Order - Appointing Guardian - Person only

Minute Order

1/6/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/6/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing - NOTICE OF HEARING AND PROOF OF SERVICE

12/11/2019: Notice - Hearing - NOTICE OF HEARING AND PROOF OF SERVICE

Notice - Probate Investigators Appointment: 12/03/2019 at 1:00pm in Room 233

11/15/2019: Notice - Probate Investigators Appointment: 12/03/2019 at 1:00pm in Room 233

Order - Prescribing Notice

10/15/2019: Order - Prescribing Notice

Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

10/15/2019: Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

Declaration - UCCJEA

10/15/2019: Declaration - UCCJEA

Memorandum - Points and Authorities

10/15/2019: Memorandum - Points and Authorities

Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial)

10/15/2019: Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial)

Duties of Guardian

10/15/2019: Duties of Guardian

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

10/15/2019: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketOrder - Eligibility for Special Immigrant Juvenile Status; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Guardian (Person only ); Filed by Nominee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 99, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Special Immigrant Juvenile Status Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 99, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Conservator - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings filed on October 15, 2019 by Marco Antonio Julio Gabriel Rosario. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) filed on October 15, 2019 by Marco Antonio Julio Gabriel Rosario. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketReport - Court Investigator

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketConsent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketDuties of Guardian; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketOrder - Prescribing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketPetition - Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketMemorandum - Points and Authorities; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROBATE INVESTIGATORS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODRIGUEZ BARBARA MARIA