This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2019 at 01:52:49 (UTC).

ROSANA TORRES ET AL VS HAROLYN LANDAU

Case Summary

On 01/18/2018 ROSANA TORRES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HAROLYN LANDAU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RITA MILLER and LIA MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0746

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RITA MILLER

LIA MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TORRES ROSANA

PARDO ANITA

Defendant

LANDAU HAROLYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

UNGAR MICHAEL T. ESQ.

UNGAR MICHAEL T.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT ON PROMISSORY NOTE

1/18/2018: COMPLAINT ON PROMISSORY NOTE

SUMMONS

1/18/2018: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/24/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/30/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

5/9/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/17/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

6/27/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

8/7/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Certificate of Mailing for

1/29/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

1/29/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/23/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/24/2018: Minute Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (of Entire action for Failure to Submit Default Package) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire action for Failur...) of 01/29/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire action for Failur...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Docketat 08:59 AM in Department 16; (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-10-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO SUBMIT DEFAULT JUDGMENT PA...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Docketat 08:59 AM in Department 16; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rosana Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-05-09 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rosana Torres (Plaintiff); Anita Pardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ON PROMISSORY NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

MICHAEL T. UNGAR, ESQ. 715 Silver Spur Road, #209 Rolling Hills Est., CA 90274 Fgl D,

(310) 377-9500 Subesiar Cat o evigr Cauwt of California | SBN: 63061 pCouMy of Los Angeles

JAN 18 2018

| Attorney for Plaintiffs Sherri R, Carter, Executive Officer/Clerk ol b e

Moses Soto

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

BC690746

ROSANA TORRES, an individual;

ANITA PARDO, an individual, Plaintiffs,

COMPLAINT ON PROMISSORY NOTE

(DAMAGES: Exceeding $25,000.00)

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,

HAROLYN LANDAU, an individual; ) )

Defendants. ) )

FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION

(Breach of Promissory Note

Comes now the plaintiffs and for a cause of action against the defendants, and each of them, alleges:

1. That at all times herein mentioned, plaintiffs, ROSANA TORRES and ANITA PARDO were individuals and residents of the State of California. |

1. That the true names and capacities of defendants DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, whether individual, corporate, associate

or. otherwise, are unknown to plaintiffs at this time, who

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer UNGAR MICHAEL T.