This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2022 at 12:08:31 (UTC).

ROSAMOND RANCH, LP VS SOUTH LA CIENEGA HOLDINGS, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 ROSAMOND RANCH, LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOUTH LA CIENEGA HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0406

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ROSAMOND RANCH LP

CALITEX

CALITEX LLC

SHOKRIAN ELIAS

ROES 1 THROUGH 10

BOISSE DEREK

SARRA NERI

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SOUTH LA CIENEGA HOLDINGS LLC

HICE AUSTIN

PROMONTORY HOLDINGS LLC

WMK CORPORATION

MORRISON KENNY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

ROBISON WILLIAM

ROBISON WILLIAM C

CHANG ALBERT

CHANG HYUNSUK ALBERT

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

JABLON ANDREW J.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/20/2021

7/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/20/2021

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/20/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/15/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/15/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/15/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/15/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/15/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/15/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR CROSS-DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/13/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR CROSS-DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

5/13/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Substitution of Attorney

5/7/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/30/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

4/12/2021: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/14/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/14/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 2:33 PM in Department M; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice (Of Continuance Of Case Management Conference); Filed by Rosamond Ranch, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((South La Cienega Holdings, LLC)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rosamond Ranch, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rosamond Ranch, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rosamond Ranch, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROMONTORY HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ROSAMOND RANCH LP is a litigant

Latest cases where WMK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CALITEX LLC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant