This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/01/2020 at 10:13:20 (UTC).

ROSALYNN TUCKER VS JUAN MORALES; ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/27/2018 ROSALYNN TUCKER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JUAN MORALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT B. BROADBELT, STUART M. RICE and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2702

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

STUART M. RICE

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TUCKER ROSALYNN AN INDIVIDUAL

TUCKER ROSALYNN

TUCKER ROSALYN

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

MORALES JUAN AN INDIVIDUAL

MORALES JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CYNTHIA VELASCO ESQ.

VELASCO CYNTHIA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL)

1/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA VELASCO, ESQ.

10/17/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA VELASCO, ESQ.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE DEFAUL...)

9/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE DEFAUL...)

Proof of Service by Mail

8/20/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

8/20/2019: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

8/20/2019: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL; CASE M...)

6/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL; CASE M...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL)

3/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/27/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons

2/27/2018: Summons

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-07-09 00:00:00

7/9/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-07-09 00:00:00

Minute Order

8/28/2018: Minute Order

Notice - Notice NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

1/7/2019: Notice - Notice NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Application - Application Application for Publication

1/22/2019: Application - Application Application for Publication

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/26/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Continuance -

8/30/2018: Notice of Continuance -

Case Management Statement -

7/5/2018: Case Management Statement -

Request - FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/12/2018: Request - FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • Hearing03/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: re Default Judgment/Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: (re Default Judgment/Dismissal) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re Default Judgment/Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: (re Default Judgment/Dismissal) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re Default Judgment/Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketStatement of the Case (in Support of Request for Default Judgment); Filed by Rosalyn Tucker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketApplication (for Default Judgment by Court); Filed by Rosalyn Tucker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Rosalynn Tucker in Support of Request for Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP Section 585(d)); Filed by Rosalyn Tucker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Rosalyn Tucker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Cynthia Velasco, ESQ.); Filed by Rosalyn Tucker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-07-09 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Rosalyn Tucker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rosalyn Tucker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Rosalyn Tucker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rosalyn Tucker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Rosalyn Tucker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Rosalyn Tucker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rosalyn Tucker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: YC072702    Hearing Date: March 16, 2020    Dept: SWB

NOTICE OF REJECTION

OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

YC072702

The Court has identified the following deficiencies:

- Plaintiff does not provide any authority for an award of attorney’s fees. Further, there is no declaration supporting the amount requested.

- There is no evidence supporting damages for $45,000 rent paid or $8,500 property damage, as stated in the Summary of Case.

- Plaintiff fails to provide sufficient evidence for transportation in the amount of $300. Her declaration does not provide sufficient detail as to this amount.

- Plaintiff fails to provide authority for the recovery of loss of personal belongings, including furniture, clothing, or appliances. There does not appear to be a cause of action whereby such damages are recoverable. She does not allege that she was locked out and her belongings sold. She does not allege a cause of action for wrongful eviction.

- Plaintiff fails to provide sufficient evidence that the refrigerator and microwave are valued at $1,000.

- Plaintiff does not provide authority to be reimbursed for payments made to Donald Hicks. Further, presumably, plaintiff would have incurred such costs even if she had not been evicted. Moreover, plaintiff fails to sufficiently support this amount.

- The evidence is insufficient to support $75,000 in emotional distress damages.

- Plaintiff is not entitled to punitive damages without evidence of defendant’s net worth.

- Plaintiff is to breakdown damages based on cause of action.

The OSC re entry of default judgment is CONTINUED to