Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 06:42:47 (UTC).

ROSALINDA SCHMITT VS ASH HOP INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 ROSALINDA SCHMITT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ASH HOP INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8091

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHMITT ROSALINDA

Defendants

ASH HOP INC. A CORPORATION

ASH HOP II INC. A CORPORATION

ASHOORI FARSHAD DAN

ASH HOP III INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHRAGER KATHERINE M.

Defendant Attorney

NEWMAN PAUL ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Answer

11/9/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

11/9/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/13/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/13/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/13/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/13/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

8/7/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

8/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/27/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/27/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/28/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2023
  • Hearing07/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Hearing01/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Hearing01/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Ash Hop Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ash Hop Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rosalinda Schmitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rosalinda Schmitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rosalinda Schmitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rosalinda Schmitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Rosalinda Schmitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rosalinda Schmitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rosalinda Schmitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rosalinda Schmitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHRAGER, KATHERINE M