This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2021 at 03:48:13 (UTC).

ROSALIE WILLIAMS, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, STEFA SICHON, ET AL. VS INLAND VALLEY PARTNERS, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 ROSALIE WILLIAMS, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, STEFA SICHON filed an Other lawsuit against INLAND VALLEY PARTNERS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3112

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROSALIE WILLIAMS BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST STEFA SICHON

SICHON STEFA

Defendant

INLAND VALLEY PARTNERS LLC DBA INLAND VALLEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHARIBIAN ARTIN

Defendant Attorney

WALKER KATHLEEN M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/22/2021: Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEFA SICHON (AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ROSALIE WILLIAMS PURSUANT TO CCP 377.32)

6/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEFA SICHON (AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ROSALIE WILLIAMS PURSUANT TO CCP 377.32)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Demand for Jury Trial

9/7/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS

9/7/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS

Case Management Statement

9/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

9/3/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/3/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/31/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

8/31/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/20/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Ruling

9/20/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

9/20/2021: Notice of Ruling

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • Hearing12/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed on Defendant's Counsel for the Failure to Appear on 9/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • Hearing12/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by ROSALIE WILLIAMS, by and through her Successor-In-Interest, Stefa Sichon (Plaintiff); STEFA SICHON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by ROSALIE WILLIAMS, by and through her Successor-In-Interest, Stefa Sichon (Plaintiff); STEFA SICHON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF TRIAL ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS); Filed by INLAND VALLEY PARTNERS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by INLAND VALLEY PARTNERS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by INLAND VALLEY PARTNERS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by INLAND VALLEY PARTNERS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by INLAND VALLEY PARTNERS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by ROSALIE WILLIAMS, by and through her Successor-In-Interest, Stefa Sichon (Plaintiff); STEFA SICHON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ROSALIE WILLIAMS, by and through her Successor-In-Interest, Stefa Sichon (Plaintiff); STEFA SICHON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ROSALIE WILLIAMS, by and through her Successor-In-Interest, Stefa Sichon (Plaintiff); STEFA SICHON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF STEFA SICHON (AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ROSALIE WILLIAMS PURSUANT TO CCP 377.32)); Filed by ROSALIE WILLIAMS, by and through her Successor-In-Interest, Stefa Sichon (Plaintiff); STEFA SICHON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ROSALIE WILLIAMS, by and through her Successor-In-Interest, Stefa Sichon (Plaintiff); STEFA SICHON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ROSALIE WILLIAMS, by and through her Successor-In-Interest, Stefa Sichon (Plaintiff); STEFA SICHON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ROSALIE WILLIAMS, by and through her Successor-In-Interest, Stefa Sichon (Plaintiff); STEFA SICHON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INLAND VALLEY PARTNERS LLC DBA INLAND VALLEY CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GHARIBIAN ARTIN