This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2022 at 00:01:41 (UTC).

ROSALIA HARRIS VS NAREK ARMENI MARKOSYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 ROSALIA HARRIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NAREK ARMENI MARKOSYAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6774

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS ROSALIA

Defendants

MAPLEBEAR INC. DBA INSTACART

MARKOSYAN NAREK ARMENI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STERN MORRIS M.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

5/20/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

5/20/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/20/2022: Complaint

Request for Dismissal

10/19/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Rosalia Harris on 05/20/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Rosalia Harris as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Rosalia Harris (Plaintiff); Maplebear, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Narek Armeni Markosyan (Defendant); Maplebear, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Rosalia Harris (Plaintiff); As to: Narek Armeni Markosyan (Defendant); Maplebear, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rosalia Harris (Plaintiff); As to: Narek Armeni Markosyan (Defendant); Maplebear, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Rosalia Harris (Plaintiff); As to: Narek Armeni Markosyan (Defendant); Maplebear, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAPLEBEAR INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERN MORRIS