This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2023 at 11:42:01 (UTC).

ROSALBA PEREZ, ET AL. VS JOHN W. CHAPMAN, II, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 ROSALBA PEREZ, filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JOHN W CHAPMAN, II,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1647

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAC CANN FIONAN

PEREZ ROSALBA

Defendants

CHAPMAN JOHN W. II

CHAPMAN MEREDITH M.

LOTUS PROPERTY SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCNICHOLAS COURTNEY C.

LANG KARIN RACHEL

ERSOFF VICTORIA L.

MITCHELTREE TARA

Defendant Attorney

CRANE ALISON MCNABOE

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND PROPOSED ORDER

7/5/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND PROPOSED ORDER

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

10/4/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR CALIXTA

4/7/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR CALIXTA

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

4/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/25/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/25/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MEANS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, SECTION 1010.6(E) AND (F)

5/25/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MEANS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, SECTION 1010.6(E) AND (F)

Substitution of Attorney

6/10/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

6/10/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

7/13/2022: Case Management Statement

Complaint

4/6/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/6/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/08/2024

Hearing04/08/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2024

Hearing03/29/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation to Continue Trial and Proposed Order; Signed and Filed by: Rosalba Perez (Plaintiff); Fionan Mac Cann (Plaintiff); Calixta Cielo Mc Cann (Plaintiff); As to: John W. Chapman, II (Defendant); Meredith M. Chapman (Defendant); Lotus Property Services, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation to Continue Trial and Proposed Order: Filed By: Rosalba Perez (Plaintiff),Fionan Mac Cann (Plaintiff),Calixta Cielo Mc Cann (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 07/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Jury Trial scheduled for 10/02/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 04/08/2024 10:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 09/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 03/29/2024 09:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022

DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 68 - Hon. Douglas W. Sterneffective 10/10/2022; Reason: Inventory Transfer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2022

DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022

DocketJury Trial scheduled for 10/02/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
04/06/2022

DocketAddress for Karin Rachel Lang (Attorney) null

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022

DocketAddress for Grant Kevin Riley (Attorney) null

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rosalba Perez (Plaintiff); Fionan Mac Cann (Plaintiff); Calixta Cielo Mc Cann (Plaintiff); As to: John W. Chapman, II (Defendant); Meredith M. Chapman (Defendant); Lotus Property Services, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark V. Mooney in Department 68 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less