This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/04/2022 at 09:44:54 (UTC).

ROSA ZAVALA VS DESIREE FLORES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 ROSA ZAVALA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DESIREE FLORES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0131

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

ZAVALA ROSA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

FLORES DESIREE

PROVIDENT TITLE COMPANY

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC.

FLORES DAVID

AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC

ZAVALA ROSA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FARRELL DAVID PATRICK

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

KENDALL EILEEN MARGRET

SATTERLY JASON LEE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SATTERLY JASON LEE

 

Court Documents

Answer

1/18/2022: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

12/13/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

12/10/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail

11/16/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

11/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/23/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Case Management Statement

11/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/30/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Cross-Complaint

11/4/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

11/4/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

11/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Mail

11/4/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

11/4/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal

10/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/8/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2023
  • Hearing05/15/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • Hearing05/08/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Rosa Zavala (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Desiree Flores (Cross-Defendant); David Flores (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rosa Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Rosa Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Rosa Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Rosa Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Rosa Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Rosa Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rosa Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rosa Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint (with Demand for Jury Trial); Filed by Rosa Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROVIDENT TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Satterly, Jason L