This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2021 at 05:45:56 (UTC).

ROSA TALAMANTES VS CREIGHTON BOOTH

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 ROSA TALAMANTES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CREIGHTON BOOTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2714

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TALAMANTES ROSA

Defendant

BOOTH CREIGHTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BLOCK RYAN G.

 

Court Documents

Answer

8/2/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/17/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • Hearing11/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CREIGHTON BOOTH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ROSA TALAMANTES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ROSA TALAMANTES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ROSA TALAMANTES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O