This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/30/2022 at 16:57:26 (UTC).

ROSA RIOS VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 ROSA RIOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5983

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIOS ROSA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

ORTIZ & SON INC.. DBA ORTIZ TRACTOR/CONSTRUCTION SERVICES

Cross Defendant

LACMTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMOSCATO ANTHONY M

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

WOODWARD KAREN ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/30/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

10/29/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

2/14/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

2/10/2022: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/26/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2024
  • Hearing09/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • Hearing03/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • Hearing03/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Rosa Rios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rosa Rios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rosa Rios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rosa Rios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rosa Rios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORTIZ & SON INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LACMTA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMOSCATO ANTHONY M.