This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2020 at 04:21:53 (UTC).

ROSA POL VS THE QUEEN MARY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2020 ROSA POL filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THE QUEEN MARY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4149

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POL ROSA

Defendants

THE QUEEN MARY

THE CITY OF LONG BEACH

URBAN COMMONS QUEENSWAY LLC

URBAN COMMONS LLC

THE QUEEN MARY HERITAGE FOUNDATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROSHCHIY OLGA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/15/2020: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/7/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/7/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/7/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

4/27/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/13/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • Hearing04/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • Hearing10/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Hearing09/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rosa Pol (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Rosa Pol (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Rosa Pol (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Rosa Pol (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rosa Pol (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rosa Pol (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rosa Pol (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE QUEEN MARY is a litigant

Latest cases where URBAN COMMONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where URBAN COMMONS QUEENSWAY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LONG BEACH is a litigant